Trustees HARTLEPOOL CARERS
Charity number: 1132951
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bev Hart | Chair | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Lynne Brown | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Garrett | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Hansen | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Pauline Robson | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin Brown | Trustee | 25 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.