Accounts and annual returns BLACKPOOL OPERATIC PLAYERS

Charity number: 500663
Charity reporting is up to date (165 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 December 2024 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 December 2024 165 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 November 2023 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 June 2024 357 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 February 2023 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 July 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 September 2020 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 September 2020 80 days late Download Open in new window