Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN REVIVAL CENTRE MINISTRY

Charity number: 1136957
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 04 February 2014 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 04 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required