Financial history FRIENDS OF NEWBOLD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1133026
Charity reporting is overdue by 404 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £1.72k £2.83k £1.93k £344 £1.37k
Total expenditure £1.69k £2.62k £1.68k £5.07k £226
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A