Financial history SCHOOL AID 4 AFRICA

Charity number: 1137365
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 13/10/2017
Total gross income £13.32k £1.52k £9.21k £4.35k £72
Total expenditure £9.82k £11.69k £958 £31.59k £7.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A