Trustees LITTLE THETFORD ACORNS
Charity number: 1132906

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Wardle | Chair | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Broadbent | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edwina Warrington | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Slok | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emmeline Parker Boreham | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Baker | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth McKiernan | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bond | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.