Financial history BRENTWOOD COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1135063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £294.71k £226.37k £252.71k £313.68k £320.25k
Total expenditure £300.16k £174.92k £255.62k £261.21k £296.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £284.49k £100.33k £92.72k £145.43k £105.17k