Financial history THAMES VALLEY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity Number: 1138320
Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £23.37k £18.79k £24.67k £17.88k £16.99k
Total expenditure £26.07k £20.41k £24.12k £18.23k £25.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A