Accounts and annual returns WIGMORE ASCENT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1136993
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required