Accounts and annual returns COMBE DOWN PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1135384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 September 2020 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required