Financial history THE BASTION BATON

Charity number: 1135897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £7.51k £135.62k £124.89k £113.33k £8.36k
Total expenditure £18.24k £89.34k £172.26k £82.17k £15.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A