Financial history DUNSVILLE COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 500856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.65k £21.16k £6.07k £23.40k £23.65k
Total expenditure £15.05k £13.87k £12.10k £23.37k £21.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £12.25k N/A £1.30k £1.80k