Governing document APRENDER (UK) LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/08/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/02/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AND EDUCATIONAL STAFF IN BRAZIL, (ALTHOUGH THE CHARITY MAY OPERATE IN OTHER COUNTRIES AT THE TRUSTEES DISCRETION) BY: - WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH RELEVANT NATIONAL EDUCATION DEPARTMENTS TO INCREASE EDUCATORS KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND CAPABILITIES; - THE PROVISION OF TEACHER TRAINING, CONSTANCY AND MENTORING; - THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND MATERIALS
Area of benefit
BRAZIL,
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.