Accounts and annual returns HINDU COMMUNITY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1136595
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 14 April 2020 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 January 2020 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 14 April 2020 350 days late