Accounts and annual returns RAINBOW'S END (ROSELAND)

Charity Number: 1137367
Charity reporting is overdue by 660 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 294 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 294 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 660 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 660 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 June 2023 335 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 30 June 2023 335 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 August 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 13 August 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 August 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 22 August 2020 23 days late Download Open in new window