Financial history THE GOSPEL FAITH MISSION INTERNATIONAL (GOFAMINT)UK BRANCH

Charity number: 1141785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £79.37k £49.31k £55.74k £54.52k £116.41k
Total expenditure £82.19k £49.37k £56.18k £48.87k £88.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A