Trustees TAMWORTH WELLBEING AND CANCER SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity Number: 1136569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adrian Bell Chair 24 November 2020
None on record
Jeanette Taylor Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
David Palmer Trustee 24 October 2016
None on record
Julia Fallon Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record
CATHY TIBBLES Trustee 14 October 2013
None on record