Accounts and annual returns GENERAL FOUNDATION APOSTOLIC CHURCH IN CHRIST

Charity Number: 1139244
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 February 2025 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 December 2023 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 January 2022 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required