Financial history ENGLAND SQUASH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.81k £16 £200 £7.09k £185
Total expenditure £2.40k £2.21k £3.09k £7.21k £7.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A