Financial history CAR COLSTON AND SCREVETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 500954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £14.91k £2.53k £5.42k £6.84k £5.43k
Total expenditure £9.98k £5.25k £6.23k £7.15k £7.27k
Income from government contracts £200 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A