Accounts and annual returns DEWSBURY AND DISTRICT ARTS COUNCIL

Charity Number: 500984
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 17 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 03 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 30 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required