Financial history CHRIST EVANGELICAL MINISTRIES (MANCHESTER)

Charity Number: 1138104
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.76k £19.12k £23.36k £22.27k £30.65k
Total expenditure £22.09k £9.24k £20.33k £21.34k £21.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A