Accounts and annual returns ATLAS CHRISTIAN OUTREACH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1136888
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 31 March 2015 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 30 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 12 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required