Accounts and annual returns HAUT CONSEIL DES BENINOIS DE L'EXTERIEUR SECTION UK

Charity number: 1137127
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 12 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 12 April 2016 18 June 2017 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 12 April 2015 18 June 2016 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 April 2015 Not Required