Accounts and annual returns BMC COLLEGE OF LEADERSHIP

Charity Number: 1138861
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 August 2019 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required