Accounts and annual returns PAN-AFRICAN ESSENTIALMEDICINES & CLINICAL PHARMACY CONSULTING GROUP)

Charity number: 1141592
Charity reporting is overdue by 904 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
Annual return 30 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 539 days
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 539 days
Annual return 30 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 904 days
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 904 days
Annual return 30 January 2021 22 January 2022 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 January 2020 24 March 2021 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2020 Not Required