Financial history NH SOUND

Charity number: 1137868
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 01/01/2018
Total gross income £4.53k £7.12k £6.24k £8.99k £7.31k
Total expenditure £4.53k £5.68k £4.22k £1.81k £6.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A