Financial history SAVED (USAP)

Charity number: 1138259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.00k £9.65k £9.29k £9.09k £8.44k
Total expenditure £2.36k £365 £198 £645 £380
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A