Financial history FRIENDS OF DEARHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1136639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.00k £6.98k £1.35k £4.04k £394
Total expenditure £10.54k £6.46k £912 £2.48k £374
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A