Financial history LEEMAN ROAD PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1137011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £102.75k £85.80k £49.12k £77.92k £74.47k
Total expenditure £92.91k £93.43k £83.03k £66.36k £72.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £70.82k £59.77k
Income from government grants £96.63k £3.91k £3.91k £546 £161