Accounts and annual returns PARENTS IN NEED OF SUPPORT
Charity number: 1139746
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 14 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 14 July 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 19 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 19 May 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 07 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
07 July 2014 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window