Accounts and annual returns P R CENTRE LTD

Charity Number: 1138350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 25 March 2025 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 25 March 2025 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 31 January 2023 337 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 March 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required