Financial history LITTLE OWLS PLAYGROUP (ACKLAM)

Charity number: 1139189
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/07/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £35.84k £59.94k £47.01k £45.53k £0
Total expenditure £37.40k £56.12k £47.25k £46.56k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0