Financial history Sheffield Women's Aid

Charity number: 1138460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £773.52k £798.29k £944.27k £995.02k £972.47k
Total expenditure £733.79k £753.10k £841.45k £841.15k £848.70k
Income from government contracts N/A £349.76k £525.00k £525.00k £0
Income from government grants £350.00k £43.79k N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £12.59k £32.44k £8.55k £32.15k £19.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £760.85k £456.82k £934.51k £962.70k £952.55k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £80 £108 £167 £165 £157
Income - Other £0 £308.93k £1.05k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £733.79k £753.10k £841.45k £841.15k £848.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £32.81k £32.81k £2.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0