Accounts and annual returns BASILDON EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP LIMITED (BEP)

Charity number: 1138281
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 December 2019 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 07 December 2019 160 days late
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 December 2019 524 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 06 December 2019 524 days late