Governing document FAITHFUL HEALING MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/2015 AS AMENDED ON 21 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUL 2017 as amended on 21 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF SUFFERERS OF PHYSICAL AND SEXUAL ABUSE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING SAFE REFUGES SET UP ESPECIALLY FOR THOSE IN NEED AND DANGER AND TO FEED, CLOTHE AND COUNSEL THEM AS NEEDED AND ALSO FURTHERING CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY BY ADVANCING OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SEEN FIT BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.