Trustees FESTIVAL DRAYTON CENTRE
Charity number: 1139372

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GEOFF VERNON | Chair | 17 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Susan Trueman | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Donald Harrison | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Edwards | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Kay | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Faul | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MURIEL HOLLAND | Trustee | 17 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN MORRIS | Trustee | 17 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JAYNE PARROTTE | Trustee | 17 August 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.