Accounts and annual returns INDIGENOUS PEOPLES LINKS

Charity number: 1144324
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 02 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 05 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 05 June 2015 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2013 03 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 03 June 2014 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2012 06 August 2013 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 06 August 2013 7 days late