Financial history DISCOVER ISLAM EUROPE LIMITED

Charity number: 1146212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £92.15k £79.25k £65.16k £100.23k £66.91k
Total expenditure £90.51k £57.67k £58.28k £106.07k £96.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A