Financial history LIGHT UPON LIGHT

Charity number: 1138579
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2012 28/02/2013 28/02/2014 28/02/2015 28/02/2016
Total gross income £9.64k £34.07k £10.73k £14.63k £9.94k
Total expenditure £5.66k £24.36k £19.77k £11.99k £10.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A