Financial history BOWEL CANCER WEST

Charity number: 1140271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £98.70k £31.83k £75.35k £87.53k £80.95k
Total expenditure £110.03k £57.33k £56.88k £85.48k £82.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £32.16k N/A £2.00k