Accounts and annual returns THE DONALD ANDERSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1138971
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 04 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 21 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 30 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required