Financial history THE ORDER OF THE BLACK SHEEP

Charity Number: 1143335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £6.33k £3.68k £9.55k £3.91k £6.56k
Total expenditure £9.04k £9.57k £6.14k £8.25k £9.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A