Financial history BRAMHALL U3A

Charity Number: 1138641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.64k £19.73k £29.92k £37.49k £36.74k
Total expenditure £14.55k £19.92k £32.20k £34.94k £34.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A