Accounts and annual returns THE ARTHUR MATYAS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1138745
Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 March 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 March 2022 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required