Accounts and annual returns THE RIVERS CHRISTIAN WORSHIP CENTRE CHURCH OF ALL NATIONS

Charity Number: 1138557
Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 16 May 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 20 July 2023 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 October 2022 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required