Financial history CPA STUDIOS

Charity Number: 1139730
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £721.36k £1.07m £1.11m £1.17m £1.12m
Total expenditure £684.37k £1.05m £1.12m £1.22m £1.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £650 £508 £1.81k £587 £559
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £720.70k £1.06m £1.10m £1.16m £1.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8 £42 £75 £30 £16
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £10.36k £12.58k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £674.41k £1.03m £1.12m £1.21m £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £2.40k £2.55k
Expenditure - Governance £8.06k £9.29k £7.17k £11.93k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0