Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH UPPER ARMLEY
Charity number: 1138550

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Claire Dilworth | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chinomso Florence Nwachukwu | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norman Mark Dearden | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Sarsfield | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isabella Inman | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAURA STUBBS | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev PHILIP ROBERT ARNOLD | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES APPLETON | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MOYRA THOMAS | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANTHONY DUNNE BSC FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.