Trustees THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE DENBIGHSHIRE INFIRMARY
Charity number: 501393

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EVA EDWARDS | Chair | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Parry Lloyd | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Helen Smith | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jones | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gwenfyl Rhian Lloyd | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Liz Parry | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Frances Jones | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Menna Jones | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr R Gwynn Parry | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Thomas | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Jones | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ROSEMARY JONES | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN JONES | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS MARGT MADOC JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.