Financial history CHELWOOD HOUSE FOR FAMILIES

Charity number: 1145048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.59k £23.15k £6.34k £786 £160
Total expenditure £12.62k £11.24k £31.50k £7.02k £1.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A